+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On September 9, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On June 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (Transportation) in Senate with 6 On Its Merits
- Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
On June 21, 2022 in the House:
- Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 NO
On June 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Transportation Committee in Senate
On June 16, 2022 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (Administration) in House with 4 On Its Merits
On June 10, 2022 in the House:
- Introduced and Assigned to Administration Committee in House
+ − Votes (2)
: House Vote
- Yeas: 40
- Nays: 1
: Senate Vote
- Yeas: 21
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor