+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On October 7, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On July 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
On June 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (Legislative Oversight & Sunset) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits
On June 21, 2022 in the House:
- Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES
On June 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Legislative Oversight & Sunset Committee in Senate
On June 16, 2022 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (Sunset Committee (Policy Analysis & Government Accountability)) in House with 3 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits
On June 10, 2022 in the House:
- Introduced and Assigned to Sunset Committee (Policy Analysis & Government Accountability) Committee in House
+ − Votes (2)
: House Vote
- Yeas: 41
: Senate Vote
- Yeas: 21