+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On June 30, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On June 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed By Senate. Votes: 17 YES 1 NO 3 ABSENT
On June 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (Sunset) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits, 1 Unfavorable
On June 14, 2018 in the House:
- Amendment HA 1 to HB 457 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
- Amendment HA 1 to HB 457 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
- Passed By House. Votes: 30 YES 6 NO 4 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT
On June 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Sunset Committee in Senate
On June 13, 2018 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (Administration) in House with 5 On Its Merits
On June 12, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced and Assigned to Administration Committee in House
+ − Votes (2)
: House Vote
- Yeas: 30
- Nays: 6
- Present/NV: 4
: Senate Vote
- Yeas: 17
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor