+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On August 19, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On June 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
On June 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (Health & Social Services) in Senate with 3 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits
On June 14, 2022 in the House:
- Amendment HA 1 to HB 442 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
- Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT
On June 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Health & Social Services Committee in Senate
On June 13, 2022 in the House:
- Amendment HA 1 to HB 442 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
On June 8, 2022 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (Health & Human Development) in House with 2 Favorable, 7 On Its Merits
On June 2, 2022 in the House:
- Introduced and Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House
+ − Votes (2)
: House Vote
- Yeas: 40
: Senate Vote
- Yeas: 21