+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On July 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- HS 1 for HB 434 - Necessary rules are suspended in Senate
- HS 1 for HB 434 - Necessary rules are suspended in Senate
- HS 1 for HB 434 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On June 30, 2016 in the House:
- HS 1 for HB 434 - Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 39 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On June 29, 2016 in the House:
- HS 1 for HB 434 - Reported Out of Committee (HOUSE ADMINISTRATION) in House with 5 On Its Merits
On June 22, 2016 in the House:
- Substituted by HS 1 for HB 434
- HS 1 for HB 434 - Assigned to House Administration
On June 16, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned to House Administration Committee in House
- Introduced in House and assigned to House Administration Committee
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor