+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On August 30, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On May 9, 2017 in the House:
- Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Amendment SA 1 to HB 43 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
- Amendment SA 1 to HB 43 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT
- Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (Corrections & Public Safety) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Corrections & Public Safety Committee in Senate
On March 23, 2017 in the House:
- Amendment HA 1 to HB 43 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
- Passed By House. Votes: 39 YES 2 ABSENT
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- Amendment HA 1 to HB 43 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
- Reported Out of Committee (Corrections) in House with 5 Favorable, 1 On Its Merits
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- Tabled in Committee
On January 18, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced and Assigned to Corrections Committee in House
+ − Amendment
HA 1
This Amendment clarifies that House Bill 363 of the 148th General Assembly was to enable all probation and parole officers including supervisors and director to retire without penalty after 25 years of service. This Amendment also places an effective date on the legislation of January 1, 2018.
+ − Votes (3)
: House Vote
- Yeas: 39
: Senate Vote
- Yeas: 20
: House Vote
- Yeas: 40