+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (Sunset) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits
On January 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Sunset Committee in Senate
On January 24, 2019 in the House:
- Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT
On January 23, 2019 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (Sunset Committee (Policy Analysis & Government Accountability)) in House with 4 On Its Merits
On January 17, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced and Assigned to Sunset Committee (Policy Analysis & Government Accountability) Committee in House
+ − Votes (2)
: House Vote
- Yeas: 40
: Senate Vote
- Yeas: 21
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor