+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On August 10, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On July 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
- Suspension of Rules in Senate
On June 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (Elections & Government Affairs) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits
On June 19, 2018 in the House:
- Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES
- Amendment HA 3 to HB 429 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
- Amendment HA 2 to HB 429 - Stricken in House
- Amendment HA 1 to HB 429 - Stricken in House
On June 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Elections & Government Affairs Committee in Senate
On June 14, 2018 in the House:
- Amendment HA 2 to HB 429 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
On June 7, 2018 in the House:
- Amendment HA 1 to HB 429 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
On June 6, 2018 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (Telecommunication Internet & Technology) in House with 3 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits
On May 30, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced and Assigned to Telecommunication Internet & Technology Committee in House
+ − Votes (2)
: House Vote
- Yeas: 41
: Senate Vote
- Yeas: 21
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor