+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On July 1, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On June 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT
On June 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (Judicial & Community Affairs) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits
On June 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Judicial & Community Affairs Committee in Senate
On June 7, 2018 in the House:
- Amendment HA 1 to HB 414 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
- Amendment HA 2 to HB 414 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
- Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT
On June 6, 2018 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (Administration) in House with 5 On Its Merits
On June 5, 2018 in the House:
- Amendment HA 1 to HB 414 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
On May 10, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced and Assigned to Administration Committee in House
+ − Votes (2)
: House Vote
- Yeas: 40
: Senate Vote
- Yeas: 20
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor