+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On October 1, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On June 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT
On June 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (Elections & Government Affairs) in Senate with 2 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits
On June 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Elections & Government Affairs Committee in Senate
On June 12, 2018 in the House:
- Amendment HA 1 to HB 411 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
- Amendment HA 1 to HB 411 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
- Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT
On June 6, 2018 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (Administration) in House with 2 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits
On May 8, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced and Assigned to Administration Committee in House
+ − Votes (2)
: House Vote
- Yeas: 40
: Senate Vote
- Yeas: 20
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor