+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On May 15, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 19 YES 0 NO 1 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT
- Reported Out of Committee (NATURAL RESOURCES & ENVIRONMENTAL CONTROL) in Senate with 3 Favorable, 1 On Its Merits
On April 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Natural Resources & Environmental Control Committee in Senate
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 41 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
- Amendment HA 1 Passed in House by Voice Vote
- Necessary rules are suspended in House
- Amendment HA 1 Introduced and Placed With Bill
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (NATURAL RESOURCES) in House with 8 On Its Merits
- Adopted in lieu of the original bill HB 41, and assigned to Natural Resources Committee in House
+ − Amendment
HA 1 to HS 1 for HB 41
Passed
+ − Votes (3)
May 1, 2013: HS 1 for HB 41 w/HA 1 Jaques Passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 19
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 1
April 25, 2013: HA 1 to HS 1 for HB 41 Jaques (House)
April 25, 2013: HS 1 for HB 41 w/HA 1 Jaques Passed (House)
- Yeas: 41
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor