+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On July 17, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On June 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Rules Suspended in Senate
- Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT
On June 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (Labor) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits
On June 14, 2018 in the House:
- Amendment HA 1 to HB 408 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
- Passed By House. Votes: 37 YES 4 ABSENT
On June 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Labor Committee in Senate
On May 9, 2018 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (Labor) in House with 9 On Its Merits
On May 3, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced and Assigned to Labor Committee in House
+ − Votes (2)
: House Vote
- Yeas: 37
: Senate Vote
- Yeas: 20