+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On August 10, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On July 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT
- Necessary rules are suspended in Senate
On June 28, 2016 in the House:
- Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 38 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 3 ABSENT 0 VACANT
- Amendment HA 1 - Passed in House by Voice Vote
On June 22, 2016 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (VETERANS AFFAIRS) in House with 18 On Its Merits
On June 15, 2016 in the House:
- Amendment HA 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
On June 7, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced and Assigned to Veterans Affairs Committee in House
+ − Amendment
HA 1 to HB 407
Passed
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor