+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On August 29, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On June 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
On June 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (Health, Children & Social Services) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits
On June 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Health, Children & Social Services Committee in Senate
On June 7, 2018 in the House:
- Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES
On May 9, 2018 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (Health & Human Development) in House with 8 On Its Merits
On May 3, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced and Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House
+ − Votes (2)
: House Vote
- Yeas: 41
: Senate Vote
- Yeas: 21