+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On June 26, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On June 4, 2019 in the House:
- Passed By House. Votes: 39 YES 2 ABSENT
On May 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Amendment SA 1 to HB 40 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
- Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
On March 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (Environmental & Natural Resources) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Environmental & Natural Resources Committee in Senate
On January 16, 2019 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (Administration) in House with 4 On Its Merits
On January 10, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced and Assigned to Administration Committee in House
+ − Votes (3)
: House Vote
- Yeas: 41
: Senate Vote
- Yeas: 21
: House Vote
- Yeas: 39
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor