+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On September 1, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On June 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On June 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (EXECUTIVE) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits
On June 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive Committee in Senate
On June 21, 2016 in the House:
- Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 39 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On June 15, 2016 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (HOUSE ADMINISTRATION) in House with 5 On Its Merits
On June 2, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced and Assigned to House Administration Committee in House
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor