+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On July 21, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On July 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
- Necessary rules are suspended in Senate
On June 25, 2014 in the House:
- Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 39 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On June 11, 2014 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (PUBLIC SAFETY & HOMELAND SECURITY) in House with 1 Favorable, 8 On Its Merits
On June 10, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced in House and assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee
- Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee in House
+ − Votes (2)
July 1, 2014: HB 397 Mitchell Passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 21
June 25, 2014: HB 397 Mitchell Passed (House)
- Yeas: 39
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor