+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On July 11, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On June 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Rules Suspended in Senate
- Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
On June 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (Judicial & Community Affairs) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits
On June 21, 2018 in the House:
- Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT
On June 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Judicial & Community Affairs Committee in Senate
On June 6, 2018 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (Judiciary) in House with 7 On Its Merits
On May 2, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced and Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House
+ − Votes (2)
: House Vote
- Yeas: 40
: Senate Vote
- Yeas: 21
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor