+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On June 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive Committee in Senate
On June 21, 2016 in the House:
- Amendment HA 1 - Passed in House by Voice Vote
- Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 40 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On June 16, 2016 in the House:
- Amendment HA 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
On June 8, 2016 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT/BANKING/INSURANCE/COMMERCE) in House with 6 On Its Merits
On June 2, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced and Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance/Commerce Committee in House
+ − Amendment
HA 1 to HB 396
Passed
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor