+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On July 11, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On June 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
On June 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (Veterans Affairs) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits
On June 19, 2018 in the House:
- Amendment HA 1 to HB 391 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
- Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES
On June 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Veterans Affairs Committee in Senate
On May 9, 2018 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (Veterans Affairs) in House with 3 Favorable, 14 On Its Merits
On May 2, 2018 in the House:
- Amendment HA 1 to HB 391 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
On May 1, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced and Assigned to Veterans Affairs Committee in House
+ − Votes (2)
: House Vote
- Yeas: 41
: Senate Vote
- Yeas: 21
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor