+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On October 26, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On June 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
On June 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (Education) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 5 On Its Merits
On May 17, 2022 in the House:
- Passed By House. Votes: 37 YES 4 ABSENT
On May 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Education Committee in Senate
On May 11, 2022 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (Administration) in House with 5 On Its Merits
On April 28, 2022 in the House:
- Introduced and Assigned to Administration Committee in House
+ − Votes (2)
: House Vote
- Yeas: 37
: Senate Vote
- Yeas: 21
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor