+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On August 3, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On June 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On June 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (JUDICIARY) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits
On June 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Judiciary Committee in Senate
On June 14, 2016 in the House:
- Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 39 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On June 8, 2016 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (JUDICIARY) in House with 9 On Its Merits
On May 18, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced and Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor