+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On July 29, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On June 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On June 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (EXECUTIVE) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits, 1 Unfavorable
On June 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive Committee in Senate
On May 19, 2016 in the House:
- Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 34 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 7 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On May 18, 2016 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (HOUSE ADMINISTRATION) in House with 4 On Its Merits
On May 12, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced and Assigned to House Administration Committee in House
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor