+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On September 19, 2024 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On June 25, 2024 in the Senate:
- Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
On June 12, 2024 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (Education) in Senate with 4 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits
On May 23, 2024 in the House:
- Passed By House. Votes: 38 YES 3 ABSENT
On May 23, 2024 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Education Committee in Senate
On May 8, 2024 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (Education) in House with 12 On Its Merits
On April 23, 2024 in the House:
- Introduced and Assigned to Education Committee in House
+ − Votes (2)
: House Vote
- Yeas: 38
: Senate Vote
- Yeas: 21
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor