+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On July 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Defeated by Senate. Votes: Defeated 7 YES 13 NO 1 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On June 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES/ELECTIONS) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits
On June 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Administrative Services/Elections Committee in Senate
On June 9, 2016 in the House:
- Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 33 YES 2 NO 2 NOT VOTING 4 ABSENT 0 VACANT
- Amendment HA 2 - Passed in House by Voice Vote
- Amendment HA 1 - Passed in House by Voice Vote
On June 8, 2016 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (HOUSE ADMINISTRATION) in House with 5 On Its Merits
- Amendment HA 2 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
On May 10, 2016 in the House:
- Amendment HA 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
On May 5, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced and Assigned to House Administration Committee in House
+ − Amendments (2)
HA 2 to HB 375
Passed
HA 1 to HB 375
Passed
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor