+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On September 11, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On June 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 19 YES 2 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On June 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (NATURAL RESOURCES & ENVIRONMENTAL CONTROL) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits
On June 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Natural Resources & Environmental Control Committee in Senate
On June 17, 2014 in the House:
- Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 40 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT
- Amendment HA 2 - Passed in House by Voice Vote
- Amendment HA 2 - Introduced in House
- Amendment HA 1 - Passed in House by Voice Vote
- Amendment HA 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
On June 4, 2014 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (NATURAL RESOURCES) in House with 1 Favorable, 5 On Its Merits, 1 Unfavorable
On May 29, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced and Assigned to Natural Resources Committee in House
+ − Amendments (2)
HA 1 to HB 374
Passed
HA 2 to HB 374
Passed
+ − Votes (4)
June 26, 2014: HB 374 w/HA 1, HA 2 Heffernan Passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 19
- Nays: 2
June 17, 2014: HA 1 to HB 374 Heffernan (House)
June 17, 2014: HA 2 to HB 374 Heffernan (House)
June 17, 2014: HB 374 w/HA 1, HA 2 Heffernan Passed (House)
- Yeas: 40
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor