+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On October 6, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On June 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On June 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (NATURAL RESOURCES & ENVIRONMENTAL CONTROL) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits
On June 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Natural Resources & Environmental Control Committee in Senate
On June 17, 2014 in the House:
- Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 40 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On June 4, 2014 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (NATURAL RESOURCES) in House with 1 Favorable, 6 On Its Merits
On May 29, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced and Assigned to Natural Resources Committee in House
+ − Votes (2)
June 26, 2014: HB 368 Heffernan Passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 21
June 17, 2014: HB 368 Heffernan Passed (House)
- Yeas: 40
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor