+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On July 17, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On June 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Rules Suspended in Senate
- Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT
On June 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (Finance) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits
On June 5, 2018 in the House:
- Passed By House. Votes: 39 YES 2 ABSENT
On June 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Finance Committee in Senate
On April 18, 2018 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (Transportation/Land Use and Infrastructure) in House with 3 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits
On April 12, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced and Assigned to Transportation/Land Use and Infrastructure Committee in House
+ − Votes (2)
: House Vote
- Yeas: 39
: Senate Vote
- Yeas: 20
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor