+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On July 17, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On June 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT
On June 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (Banking, Business & Insurance) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits
On May 10, 2018 in the House:
- Passed By House. Votes: 37 YES 4 ABSENT
On May 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Banking, Business & Insurance Committee in Senate
On May 2, 2018 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (Economic Development/Banking/Insurance/Commerce) in House with 11 On Its Merits
On April 12, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced and Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance/Commerce Committee in House
+ − Votes (2)
: House Vote
- Yeas: 37
: Senate Vote
- Yeas: 20
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor