+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On June 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (HEALTH & SOCIAL SERVICES) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits
On June 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Health & Social Services Committee in Senate
On June 14, 2016 in the House:
- Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 40 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT
- Amendment HA 1 - Passed in House by Voice Vote
- Amendment HA 1 to HA 1 - Passed in House by Voice Vote
- Amendment HA 1 to HA 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
On June 8, 2016 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (HEALTH & HUMAN DEVELOPMENT) in House with 4 Favorable, 8 On Its Merits
- Amendment HA 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
On May 5, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced and Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor