+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On July 23, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On June 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Rules Suspended in Senate
- Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT
On June 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (Health, Children & Social Services) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits
On May 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Health, Children & Social Services Committee in Senate
On May 3, 2018 in the House:
- Passed By House. Votes: 37 YES 4 ABSENT
On April 18, 2018 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (Health & Human Development) in House with 10 On Its Merits
On March 29, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced and Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House
+ − Votes (2)
: House Vote
- Yeas: 37
: Senate Vote
- Yeas: 20