+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On April 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (Finance) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits
- Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
On April 14, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On April 13, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (Executive) in Senate with 6 On Its Merits
- Assigned to Finance Committee in Senate
On April 7, 2022 in the House:
- Amendment HA 1 to HB 360 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
- Suspension of Rules in House
- Amendment HA 1 to HB 360 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
- Passed By House. Votes: 35 YES 3 NO 3 ABSENT
On April 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive Committee in Senate
On April 6, 2022 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (Administration) in House with 4 Favorable
On April 1, 2022 in the House:
- Introduced and Assigned to Administration Committee in House
+ − Votes (2)
: House Vote
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 3
: Senate Vote
- Yeas: 21
+ − Sponsors (37)
Type:
Primary Sponsor