+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On September 9, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On June 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT
On June 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (Judiciary) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits
On April 14, 2022 in the House:
- Passed By House. Votes: 39 YES 2 ABSENT
On April 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Judiciary Committee in Senate
On April 7, 2022 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (Judiciary) in House with 6 Favorable
On March 24, 2022 in the House:
- Introduced and Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House
+ − Votes (2)
: House Vote
- Yeas: 39
: Senate Vote
- Yeas: 20
+ − Sponsors (26)
Type:
Primary Sponsor