+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On September 11, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On June 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 19 YES 1 NO 1 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On June 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (EXECUTIVE) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits
On June 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive Committee in Senate
On June 24, 2014 in the House:
- Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 40 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT
- Amendment HA 1 - Passed in House by Voice Vote
- Amendment HA 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
On June 4, 2014 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (SUNSET COMMITTEE (POLICY ANALYSIS & GOVERNMENT ACCOUNTABILITY)) in House with 4 Favorable
On May 29, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced and Assigned to Sunset Committee (Policy Analysis & Government Accountability) Committee in House
+ − Amendment
HA 1 to HB 354
Passed
+ − Votes (3)
June 30, 2014: HB 354 w/HA 1 Brady Passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 19
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
June 24, 2014: HA 1 to HB 354 Brady (House)
June 24, 2014: HB 354 w/HA 1 Brady Passed (House)
- Yeas: 40
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor