+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On July 27, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On June 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
On June 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (Transportation) in Senate with 2 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits
On May 12, 2022 in the House:
- Passed By House. Votes: 38 YES 3 ABSENT
On May 12, 2022 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Transportation Committee in Senate
On April 13, 2022 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (Public Safety & Homeland Security) in House with 7 On Its Merits
On March 15, 2022 in the House:
- Introduced and Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee in House
+ − Votes (2)
: House Vote
- Yeas: 38
: Senate Vote
- Yeas: 21
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor