+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On June 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- HS 1 for HB 348 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On June 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- HS 1 for HB 348 - Reported Out of Committee (NATURAL RESOURCES & ENVIRONMENTAL CONTROL) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits
On June 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- HS 1 for HB 348 - Assigned to Natural Resources & Environmental Control Committee in Senate
On June 18, 2014 in the House:
- HS 1 for HB 348 - Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 40 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT
- HS 1 for HB 348 - Amendment HA 1 - Passed in House by Voice Vote
- HS 1 for HB 348 - Amendment HA 1 - Introduced in House
On June 4, 2014 in the House:
- HS 1 for HB 348 - Reported Out of Committee (NATURAL RESOURCES) in House with 2 Favorable, 5 On Its Merits
On June 3, 2014 in the House:
- HS 1 for HB 348 - Assigned to Natural Resources
- Substituted by HS 1 for HB 348
On May 15, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced and Assigned to Natural Resources Committee in House
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor