+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On May 24, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On May 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 2 ABSENT
On May 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (Transportation) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits
On April 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Transportation Committee in Senate
On April 17, 2018 in the House:
- Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES
On March 28, 2018 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (Public Safety & Homeland Security) in House with 9 On Its Merits
On March 15, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced and Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee in House
+ − Votes (2)
: House Vote
- Yeas: 41
: Senate Vote
- Yeas: 19
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor