+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On July 16, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On June 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
On June 18, 2020 in the House:
- Suspension of Rules in House
- Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 NO
On June 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Suspension of Rules in Senate
On June 5, 2020 in the House:
- Introduced and Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House
+ − Votes (2)
: House Vote
- Yeas: 40
- Nays: 1
: Senate Vote
- Yeas: 21
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor