+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On August 12, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On June 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 19 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On June 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (NATURAL RESOURCES & ENVIRONMENTAL CONTROL) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits
On June 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Natural Resources & Environmental Control Committee in Senate
On June 12, 2014 in the House:
- Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 41 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On June 4, 2014 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (TRANSPORTATION/LAND USE AND INFRASTRUCTURE) in House with 4 On Its Merits
On May 14, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced and Assigned to Transportation/Land Use and Infrastructure Committee in House
+ − Votes (2)
June 25, 2014: HB 342 Mulrooney Passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 19
- Absent: 2
June 12, 2014: HB 342 Mulrooney Passed (House)
- Yeas: 41
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor