+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On August 3, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On July 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
- Necessary rules are suspended in Senate
On June 28, 2016 in the House:
- Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 39 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT
- Amendment HA 1 - Passed in House by Voice Vote
On June 21, 2016 in the House:
- Amendment HA 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
On June 8, 2016 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (NATURAL RESOURCES) in House with 4 Favorable, 5 On Its Merits
On April 28, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced and Assigned to Natural Resources Committee in House
+ − Amendment
HA 1 to HB 341
Passed