+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 20, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On March 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 37 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 4 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Amendment SA 1 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT
- Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Amendment SA 1 - Introduced and Placed With the Bill in Senate
On January 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (EDUCATION) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits
On July 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Education Committee in Senate
On July 1, 2015 in the House:
- Amendment HA 1 - Stricken
- Amendment HA 2 - Passed in House by Voice Vote
- Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 40 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On March 26, 2015 in the House:
- Amendment HA 2 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (EDUCATION) in House with 13 On Its Merits
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Amendment HA 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and Assigned to Education Committee in House
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor