+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On August 13, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On June 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 41 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On June 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
- Amendment SA 1 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT
- Amendment SA 1 - Introduced in Senate
- Reported Out of Committee (SUNSET) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits
On June 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Sunset Committee in Senate
On June 18, 2014 in the House:
- Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 40 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On June 4, 2014 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (SUNSET COMMITTEE (POLICY ANALYSIS and GOVERNMENT ACCOUNTABILITY)) in House with 4 Favorable
On May 14, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced and Assigned to Sunset Committee (Policy Analysis and Government Accountability) Committee in House
+ − Amendment
SA 1 to HB 339
Passed
+ − Votes (4)
June 30, 2014: HB 339 w/SA 1 House Consent Agenda A Passed (House)
- Yeas: 41
June 26, 2014: HB 339 w/SA 1 Bolden Passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 21
June 26, 2014: SA 1 to HB 339 Peterson Passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 20
- Absent: 1
June 18, 2014: HB 339 Bolden Passed (House)
- Yeas: 40
- Absent: 1