+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On October 14, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On June 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
On May 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (Banking, Business & Insurance) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits
On April 12, 2022 in the House:
- Amendment HA 1 to HB 338 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
- Amendment HA 1 to HB 338 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
- Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES
On April 12, 2022 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Banking, Business & Insurance Committee in Senate
On April 5, 2022 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (Economic Development/Banking/Insurance & Commerce) in House with 1 Favorable, 9 On Its Merits
On March 15, 2022 in the House:
- Introduced and Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance & Commerce Committee in House
+ − Votes (2)
: House Vote
- Yeas: 41
: Senate Vote
- Yeas: 21
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor