+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On July 20, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On June 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 19 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On June 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (BANKING AND BUSINESS) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits
On May 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Banking and Business Committee in Senate
On May 17, 2016 in the House:
- Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 39 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On May 5, 2016 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT/BANKING/INSURANCE/COMMERCE) in House with 7 On Its Merits
On May 3, 2016 in the House:
- Re-Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance/Commerce Committee in House
On April 21, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced and Assigned to House Administration Committee in House