+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On October 26, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On June 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
On May 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (Banking, Business & Insurance) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits
On April 14, 2022 in the House:
- Passed By House. Votes: 39 YES 2 ABSENT
On April 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Banking, Business & Insurance Committee in Senate
On April 5, 2022 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (Economic Development/Banking/Insurance & Commerce) in House with 3 Favorable, 7 On Its Merits
On March 15, 2022 in the House:
- Introduced and Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance & Commerce Committee in House
+ − Votes (2)
: House Vote
- Yeas: 39
: Senate Vote
- Yeas: 21
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor