+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On August 25, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On June 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Suspension of Rules in Senate
- Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES
On June 11, 2020 in the House:
- Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES
On June 4, 2020 in the House:
- Suspension of Rules in House
On May 22, 2020 in the House:
- Introduced and Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance & Commerce Committee in House
+ − Votes (2)
: House Vote
- Yeas: 41
: Senate Vote
- Yeas: 21
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor