+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On July 15, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On June 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On June 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (EXECUTIVE) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits
On June 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive Committee in Senate
On June 18, 2014 in the House:
- Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 41 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
- Amendment HA 2 - Passed in House by Voice Vote
- Amendment HA 1 - Stricken
On June 17, 2014 in the House:
- Amendment HA 2 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
On June 12, 2014 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (HOUSE ADMINISTRATION) in House with 3 On Its Merits
On June 10, 2014 in the House:
- Amendment HA 1 - Introduced in House
On May 7, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced and Assigned to House Administration Committee in House
+ − Amendments (2)
HA 2 to HB 331
Passed
HA 1 to HB 331
Stricken
+ − Votes (3)
June 30, 2014: HB 331 w/HA 2 Kowalko Passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 21
June 18, 2014: HA 2 to HB 331 Osienski (House)
June 18, 2014: HB 331 w/HA 2 Kowalko Passed (House)
- Yeas: 41
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor