+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On June 30, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On June 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 2 ABSENT
On June 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (Judiciary) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits
On May 3, 2022 in the House:
- Amendment HA 2 to HB 324 - Defeated In House by Voice Vote
- Passed By House. Votes: 37 YES 1 NO 1 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT
On May 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Judiciary Committee in Senate
On March 9, 2022 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (Public Safety & Homeland Security) in House with 7 Favorable
On March 3, 2022 in the House:
- Introduced and Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House
- Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee in House
+ − Votes (2)
: House Vote
- Yeas: 37
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
: Senate Vote
- Yeas: 19
+ − Sponsors (24)
Type:
Primary Sponsor