+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On June 26, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On June 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 19 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On June 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (EXECUTIVE) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits
On June 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive Committee in Senate
On June 3, 2014 in the House:
- Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 40 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On May 14, 2014 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (HOUSE ADMINISTRATION) in House with 5 On Its Merits
On May 6, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced and Assigned to House Administration Committee in House
+ − Votes (2)
June 12, 2014: HB 323 Osienski Passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 19
- Absent: 2
June 3, 2014: HB 323 Osienski Passed (House)
- Yeas: 40
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor