+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On June 30, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
On June 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
On June 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee (LABOR & INDUSTRIAL RELATIONS) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits
On June 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Labor & Industrial Relations Committee in Senate
On June 14, 2016 in the House:
- Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 35 YES 5 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT
- Amendment HA 1 - Passed in House by Voice Vote
On June 8, 2016 in the House:
- Amendment HA 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
On May 4, 2016 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee (LABOR) in House with 2 Favorable, 9 On Its Merits
On April 19, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced and Assigned to Labor Committee in House
+ − Amendment
HA 1 to HB 317
Passed
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor